Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Paraíba

Archidioecesis Parahybensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Aldo de Cillo Pagotto, S.S.S., Archbishop
  • Marcelo Pinto Carvalheria, Archbishop Emeritus
  • José Maria Pires, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 6 February 1914
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Paraiba
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 7,713 (2,979 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste II
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesepb.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 13, Praca Dom Adauto, 58001-970 Joao Pessoa, PB, Brazil
  • Telephone: (083) 241-3048
  • Fax: 222-1629

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Paraíba
27 April 1892ErectedDiocese of Olinda Diocese of Paraíba (erected)
29 December 1909Territory LostDiocese of Paraíba Diocese of Natal (erected)
6 February 1914Territory LostDiocese of Paraíba Diocese of Cajazeiras (erected)
Archdiocese of Paraíba
6 February 1914ElevatedDiocese of Paraíba Archdiocese of Paraíba
14 May 1949Territory LostArchdiocese of Paraíba Diocese of Campina Grande (erected)
11 October 1980Territory LostArchdiocese of Paraíba Diocese of Guarabira (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Paraíba
1948950,0001,000,00095.0%72361088,7966017953ap1948
1965912,000967,00094.3%52227412,324730542ap1967
1968950,0001,100,00086.4%49307912,0253531230ap1971
1976857,7611,143,70975.0%10172731,76832325342ap1977
1980923,0001,233,00074.9%39205915,64453323244ap1981
1990897,0001,109,00080.9%34296314,23844022233ap1991
1999870,0001,689,46051.5%62391018,61387025748ap2000
2000880,0001,689,46052.1%5039899,88785126049ap2001
2001800,6001,539,46052.0%75381137,08486724048ap2002
2002780,0001,247,72862.5%75371126,964126223154ap2003
20031,044,1001,282,84481.4%72351079,757175523058ap2004
20041,030,4161,240,02283.1%84301149,038163723859ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014