Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joviano de Lima Júnior, S.S.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1942Born
196421.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
8 Dec 196927.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
25 Oct 199553.5AppointedBishop of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
27 Dec 199553.6Ordained BishopBishop of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
5 Apr 200663.9AppointedArchbishop of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
21 Jun 201270.1DiedArchbishop of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joviano de Lima Júnior
(VIAF: 99551032; WikiData: Q1665304)
Archbishop Joviano de Lima Júnior S.S.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Ribeirão Preto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUberaba, Diocese of Uberaba
Ordained BishopSanta Teresinha, Church, Uberaba, Archdiocese of Uberaba, Minas Gerais

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,675
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 257, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 2 Oct 2023