Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hernaldo Pinto Farias, S.S.S.

Bishop of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1964 Born
25 Jan 198823.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
18 Jul 199228.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
17 Jul 201955.0AppointedBishop of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil
15 Sep 201955.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil
6 Oct 201955.2InstalledBishop of Bonfim, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Hernaldo Pinto Farias
Bishop Hernaldo Pinto Farias S.S.S. (born ) Bishop of Bonfim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVitória da Conquista, Diocese of Vitória da Conquista, Bahia
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora da Boa Viagem, Church, Belo Horizonte, Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bonfim.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jul 2019
  • ob: CB, 24 Jul 2019
  • c2+: CB, 30 Jul 2019
  • i: AM, 16 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast