Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Plínio José Luz da Silva

Bishop of Picos, Piaui, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1955 Born
16 Dec 198429.1Ordained PriestPriest of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
13 Jun 200145.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
13 Jun 200145.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Marazanae
24 Aug 200145.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marazanae
26 Nov 200348.1AppointedBishop of Picos, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Plínio José Luz da Silva
Bishop Plínio José Luz da Silva (born ) Bishop of Picos

EventPlace
Birth PlacePacoti

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Picos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,029

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast