Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Eugênio Corrêa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caratinga, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1914BornLima Duarte
26 Oct 194127.4Ordained PriestPriest of Juiz de Fora, Brazil
19 Aug 195743.2AppointedBishop of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil
10 Nov 195743.4Ordained BishopBishop of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil
27 Nov 197864.5ResignedBishop of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil
28 Jan 201095.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Eugênio Corrêa:
Bishop José Eugênio Corrêa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caratinga

  • a priest for 68.3 years
  • a bishop for 52.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013