Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Clément Marie Ghislain Charue

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Namur {Namen}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1898Born
15 Aug 192224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
12 Dec 194143.4AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
11 Feb 194243.6Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
24 Jun 197475.9RetiredBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
20 Dec 197779.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for André Clément Marie Ghislain Charue (VIAF: 64235289)
Bishop André Clément Marie Ghislain Charue (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Namur {Namen}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJemeppe-sur-Sambre
Death PlaceNamur, Diocese of Namur {Namen}

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 8
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 512, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast