Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Martin, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bururi, Burundi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1903Born
29 Jun 192623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
14 Jul 194946.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ngozi, Burundi
14 Jul 194946.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Oliva
30 Nov 194946.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oliva
10 Nov 195956.5AppointedBishop of Ngozi, Burundi
6 Jun 196158.1AppointedBishop of Bururi, Burundi
17 Sep 197370.3ResignedBishop of Bururi, Burundi
13 Jun 198279.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Bururi, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Joseph Martin
Bishop Joseph Martin M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bururi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Rémy-les-Chimay, Belgium

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast