Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Honoré-Joseph Coppieters

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1874BornOvermere
19 Dec 189622.7Ordained PriestPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
28 Jan 192752.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
28 Jan 192752.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
15 May 192753.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
17 May 192753.1SucceededBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
20 Dec 194773.7DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Honoré-Joseph Coppieters:
Bishop Honoré-Joseph Coppieters (born , died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1948
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013