Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules Victor Daem

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Antwerpen {Antwerp}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1902BornSint-Antelinks
24 Sep 192725.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 196259.9AppointedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp}, Belgium
17 May 196260.0Ordained BishopBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp}, Belgium
4 Nov 197775.4RetiredBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp}, Belgium
24 Apr 199390.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Antwerpen {Antwerp}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jules Victor Daem:
Bishop Jules Victor Daem (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Antwerpen {Antwerp}

  • a priest for 65.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015