Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Musty

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Namur {Namen}

Titular Bishop of Botriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1912BornSélange
26 Jul 193623.8Ordained PriestPriest of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
4 Oct 195744.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
4 Oct 195744.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Botriana
30 Nov 195745.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Botriana
21 Jan 199178.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
9 Dec 199280.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Musty:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Musty (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Namur {Namen}

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013