Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léonce Albert Van Peteghem

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1916BornSint-Kruis-Winkel
18 Aug 194023.9Ordained PriestPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
28 May 196447.6AppointedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
29 Jun 196447.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
27 Dec 199175.2RetiredBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
7 Jan 200487.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Léonce Albert Van Peteghem:
Bishop Léonce Albert Van Peteghem (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013