Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert-Joseph Mathen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Namur {Namen}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1916BornAubange
25 Aug 194023.7Ordained PriestPriest of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
15 Mar 197457.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
15 Mar 197457.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tituli in Numidia
3 May 197457.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tituli in Numidia
24 Jun 197457.5SucceededBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
7 Feb 199174.1ResignedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
19 Jan 199780.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Robert-Joseph Mathen:
Bishop Robert-Joseph Mathen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Namur {Namen}

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013