Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Herman Joseph Alerding

Deceased

Bishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1845BornWestphalia, Germany
22 Sep 186924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Vincennes, Indiana, USA
30 Aug 190055.4AppointedBishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
30 Nov 190055.6Ordained BishopBishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
6 Dec 192479.6DiedBishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Herman Joseph Alerding:
Bishop Herman Joseph Alerding (born , died ) Bishop of Fort Wayne

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 597

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013