Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Champenois, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Superior of Karnatic Mission / Pondicherry

Titular Bishop of Doliche


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1734³BornReims, France
13 Jan 177439.7Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jul 177642.2ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
14 Jun 178551.2AppointedCoadjutor Superior of Karnatic Mission / Pondicherry, India
14 Jun 178551.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Doliche
5 Nov 178652.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Doliche
8 Nov 179157.6SucceededSuperior of Karnatic Mission / Pondicherry, India
30 Oct 181076.5DiedSuperior of Karnatic Mission / Pondicherry, India

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Champenois
Bishop Nicolas Champenois M.E.P. (born Apr 1734, died ) Superior of Karnatic Mission / Pondicherry

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 198
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016