Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Cattaneo, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Honan {Ho-Nan Meridionale}

Titular Bishop of Hippos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1844BornCarvico, Italy
186924.3ProfessedMember of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
27 Jun 190560.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Honan {Ho-Nan Meridionale}, China
27 Jun 190560.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
1 Nov 190561.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippos
15 Dec 191066.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Honan {Ho-Nan Meridionale}, China

MicroData Summary for Angelo Cattaneo:
Bishop Angelo Cattaneo P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Honan {Ho-Nan Meridionale}

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 47
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 198

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013