Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Nanyang [Nanyang]

Dioecesis Naniamensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kaifeng [Kaifeng]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 12,000 (4,635 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Kinkia Kang, Nanyang, Henan, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Honan {Ho-Nan Meridionale}
28 August 1882SplitVicariate Apostolic of Honan {Ho-Nan} Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Honan {Ho-Nan Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Honan {Ho-Nan Meridionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Nanyang [Nanyang]
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Southern Honan {Ho-Nan Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Nanyang [Nanyang]
Diocese of Nanyang [Nanyang]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Nanyang [Nanyang] Diocese of Nanyang [Nanyang]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Nanyang [Nanyang]
195022,8074,025,000.6%82634670381ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 5 Jul 2013