Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arturo Pablo Ros Murgadas

Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

Titular Bishop of Ursona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1964 Born
29 Jun 199329.0Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
27 Jun 201652.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
27 Jun 201652.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ursona
3 Sep 201652.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ursona

MicroData Summary for Arturo Pablo Ros Murgadas
Bishop Arturo Pablo Ros Murgadas (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVinalesa
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Valencia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 Jun 2016
  • c34: CB, 3 Sep 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,092

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast