Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph L Quý Thanh

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Pht Diệm, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Septimunicia

Note/Previous Titular See: (appointment & consecration kept secret until his death)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1900Born
17 Mar 193433.9Ordained PriestPriest of Pht Diệm, Viet Nam
196362.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pht Diệm, Viet Nam
196362.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Septimunicia
13 Feb 196463.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Septimunicia
7 May 197474.1DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Pht Diệm, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph L Quý Thanh
Bishop Joseph L Quý Thanh (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Pht Diệm

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTai An Hoa
Ordained BishopCathedral, Pht Diệm, Diocese of Pht Diệm

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations piscopales
  • bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,447

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 1 Apr 2020

Quantcast