Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Camps de la Carrera y Molés

Deceased

Bishop of Bosa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1603¹Born
12 Jan 165451.0AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
11 Jul 165552.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
10 Jan 165653.0DiedBishop of Bosa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Camps de la Carrera y Molés
Bishop Francisco Camps de la Carrera y Molés (born 1603, died ) Bishop of Bosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSolsona, Diocese of Solsona, Spain
Ordained BishopGesù, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 118
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 184, Number 1,149
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 34
  • ob/c2: AT, 25 Dec 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,159
  • c34: AT, 11 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 11 Mar 2019

Quantcast