Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marc'Antonio Verità

Deceased

Bishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Jul 1633AppointedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
28 Aug 1633Ordained BishopBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
15 Oct 1650DiedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Marc'Antonio Verità
Bishop Marc'Antonio Verità (died ) Bishop of Ossero (Osor)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerona, Diocese of Verona, Italy
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 104
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 44
  • ob/c2+: AT, 11 Sep 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,004

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast