Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Maria da Silva, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Calvi Risorta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹BornAversa
4 May 167141.3AppointedBishop of Policastro, Italy
10 May 167141.3Ordained BishopBishop of Policastro, Italy
10 Apr 167949.2AppointedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy
23 May 170272.3DiedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Maria da Silva:
Bishop Vincenzo Maria da Silva O.P. (died ) Bishop of Calvi Risorta

  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 137, and Page 318
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 11 Apr 2015