Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Caramuel y Lobkowitz, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1606BornMadrid, Spain
162316.6ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
9 Jul 165751.1AppointedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
29 Jul 165751.2Ordained BishopBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
25 Sep 167367.3AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
7 Sep 168276.3DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Jean Caramuel y Lobkowitz:
Bishop Jean Caramuel y Lobkowitz O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Vigevano

  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 132
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 188, Number 1,177

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 4 Nov 2013