Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Ragona

Deceased

Bishop of Capaccio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1604¹BornTricarico
17 Oct 164440.8AppointedBishop of Acerno, Italy
23 Oct 164440.8Ordained BishopBishop of Acerno, Italy
13 Apr 166561.3AppointedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
1 Aug 167773.6DiedBishop of Capaccio, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Camillo Ragona:
Bishop Camillo Ragona (died ) Bishop of Capaccio

  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 134, and Page 66
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 108, Number 659

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013