Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso d’Ancora (Ariconi), C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Trani, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1583¹Born
12 Feb 163047.1SelectedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
9 Sep 163047.6ConfirmedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
22 Sep 163047.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
21 Jul 163451.5SelectedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
8 Jan 163552.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
1656¹73.0DiedArchbishop of Trani, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso d’Ancora (Ariconi)
Archbishop Tommaso d’Ancora (Ariconi) C.R. (born 1583, died 1656) Archbishop of Trani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalerno
Ordained BishopS. Andre della Valle, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 250, and Page 341
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 16
  • ob: CB, 13 Mar 2017
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast