Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michelangelo Vaginari, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Giovinazzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1619¹BornNapoli
10 Oct 165839.7SelectedBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy
9 Jun 165940.4ConfirmedBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy
15 Jun 165940.4Ordained BishopBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy
1667¹48.0DiedBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michelangelo Vaginari:
Bishop Michelangelo Vaginari O.F.M. , Bishop of Giovinazzo

  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 121, Number 737
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015