Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Placido Padiglia, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alessano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1579¹BornNapoli
20 Sep 162748.7AppointedBishop of Lavello, Italy
26 Sep 162748.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lavello, Italy
27 Nov 163455.9AppointedBishop of Alessano, Italy
14 Jun 164869.5DiedBishop of Alessano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Placido Padiglia:
Bishop Placido Padiglia O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Alessano

  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 217, and Page 77
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 90, Number 535

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 29 Nov 2014