Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Carafa, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Jul 1665AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
26 Jul 1665Ordained BishopBishop of Aversa, Italy
7 May 1686DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Carafa:
Bishop Paolo Carafa C.R. (died ) Bishop of Aversa

  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 106
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1665, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015