Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Cervini

Deceased

Bishop of Montepulciano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Aug 1663AppointedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
26 Aug 1663Ordained BishopBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
9 Sep 1706DiedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Cervini
Bishop Antonio Cervini (died ) Bishop of Montepulciano

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo in Lucina, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 43.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 248
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1663, Number 7
  • c4: AT, 28 Aug 2016
  • b/c24: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,032

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast