Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio Geloso

Deceased

Bishop of Patti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1595¹BornPalermo
14 Apr 161823.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jun 166974.4AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
23 Jun 166974.4Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
3 Nov 166974.8DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Geloso:
Bishop Giovanni Antonio Geloso (born 1595, died ) Bishop of Patti

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 302
  • c34: CB, 17 Mar 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015