Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Pappacoda

Deceased

Bishop of Lecce


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1595³BornPisciotta
12 Feb 163539.4AppointedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
18 Feb 163539.4Ordained BishopBishop of Capaccio, Italy
30 May 163943.7AppointedBishop of Lecce, Italy
17 Dec 167075.2DiedBishop of Lecce, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Pappacoda:
Bishop Luigi Pappacoda (born , died ) Bishop of Lecce

  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 220, and Page 134
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 95, Number 569

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013