Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Pietro (Paolo) Pinto, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Aug 1640AppointedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
19 Aug 1640Ordained BishopBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
29 Sep 1661DiedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pietro (Paolo) Pinto
Bishop Giovanni Pietro (Paolo) Pinto O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Bishop of Fondi (Fundi)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTeano, Diocese of Teano
Ordained BishopSanti Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Buried Place (Original)S. Francesco al Monte, Church, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 192
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 30
  • b/c2: AT, 24 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 26 Oct 2018

Quantcast