Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Bouvier

Deceased

Bishop of Le Mans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1783BornSaint-Charles-la-Fôret
24 Sep 180825.7Ordained PriestPriest of Le Mans, France
7 Dec 183350.9SelectedBishop of Le Mans, France
20 Jan 183451.0ConfirmedBishop of Le Mans, France
21 Mar 183451.2Ordained BishopBishop of Le Mans, France
29 Dec 185472.0DiedBishop of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Bouvier:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Bouvier (born , died ) Bishop of Le Mans

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013