Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Louis de Lesquen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rennes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1770BornTrégon
21 Sep 180535.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 182353.0SelectedBishop of Beauvais, France
16 May 182353.2ConfirmedBishop of Beauvais, France
13 Jul 182353.4Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais, France
31 Jan 182554.9SelectedBishop of Rennes, France
21 Mar 182555.1ConfirmedBishop of Rennes, France
21 Jan 184170.9ResignedBishop of Rennes, France
17 Jul 185585.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Rennes, France

MicroData Summary for Claude-Louis de Lesquen:
Bishop Claude-Louis de Lesquen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rennes

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 108, and Page 320

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013