Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Montault des Isles

Deceased

Bishop of Angers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1755Born
19 Apr 178327.9Ordained PriestPriest
4 Sep 179136.3AppointedBishop of [Vienne (Constitutional), France]
23 Oct 179136.4Ordained BishopBishop of [Vienne (Constitutional), France]
1795²39.6ResignedBishop of [Vienne (Constitutional), France]
12 Apr 180246.9SelectedBishop of Angers, France
14 Apr 180246.9ConfirmedBishop of Angers, France
29 Jul 183984.2DiedBishop of Angers, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Montault des Isles (VIAF: 172669977)
Bishop Charles Montault des Isles (born , died ) Bishop of Angers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoudun
Ordained BishopPoitiers
Death PlaceAngers, Diocese of Angers

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 47.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 74
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast