Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François de Hercé

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nantes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1776BornMayenne
18 Dec 183054.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Oct 183559.7SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Nantes, France
1 Feb 183660.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Nantes, France
1 Feb 183660.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Botrys
17 Apr 183660.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Botrys
12 May 183862.2SucceededBishop of Nantes, France
29 Nov 1848³72.8ResignedBishop of Nantes, France
31 Jan 184973.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Nantes, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-François de Hercé:
Bishop Jean-François de Hercé (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nantes

  • a priest for 18.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 116, and Page 276

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013