Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume-Laurent-Louis Angebault

Deceased

Bishop of Angers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1790BornRennes
23 Sep 181525.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 184251.8SelectedBishop of Angers, France
23 May 184251.9ConfirmedBishop of Angers, France
10 Aug 184252.1Ordained BishopBishop of Angers, France
2 Oct 186979.3DiedBishop of Angers, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume-Laurent-Louis Angebault:
Bishop Guillaume-Laurent-Louis Angebault (born , died ) Bishop of Angers

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013