Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Geoffroy Cardinal Brossais Saint-Marc

Deceased

Archbishop of Rennes

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1803BornRennes
2 Apr 183128.2Ordained PriestPriest
26 Mar 184138.1SelectedBishop of Rennes, France
12 Jul 184138.4ConfirmedBishop of Rennes, France
10 Aug 184138.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rennes, France
3 Jan 185955.9AppointedArchbishop of Rennes, France
17 Sep 187572.6Elevated to Cardinal
3 Apr 187673.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria
26 Feb 187875.1DiedArchbishop of Rennes, France

MicroData Summary for Geoffroy Brossais Saint-Marc:
Cardinal Geoffroy Brossais Saint-Marc (born , died ) Archbishop of Rennes

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
  • a cardinal for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 51
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 320

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013