Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Fietta

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Paolo alla Regola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1883Born
4 Nov 190622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ivrea, Italy
27 Feb 192642.3AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Central America
30 Mar 192642.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Serdica
10 Oct 192642.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Serdica
23 Sep 193046.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Haiti
23 Sep 193046.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Dominican Republic
20 Jun 193652.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Argentina
11 Dec 193653.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay
12 Nov 193956.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay
26 Jan 195369.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Italy
15 Dec 195875.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Paolo alla Regola
15 Dec 195875.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 195875.1RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Italy
1 Oct 196076.9DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Fietta
Giuseppe Cardinal Fietta (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Italy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIvrea, Diocese of Ivrea

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
  • a cardinal for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 65
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 42, and Page 43, and Page 104
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 142, and Page 146, and Page 158
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 180, and Page 193, and Page 200
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 223, and Page 227

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast