Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Francis Kennedy

Deceased

Rector of the Pontifical North American College

Titular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1858BornConshohocken, PA, USA
24 Jul 188729.3Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
14 Jun 190143.2AppointedRector of the Pontifical North American College
16 Dec 190749.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade
29 Dec 190749.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade
17 Jun 191557.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
28 Aug 191759.4DiedRector of the Pontifical North American College

MicroData Summary for Thomas Francis Kennedy:
Archbishop Thomas Francis Kennedy (born , died ) Rector of Pontifical North American College

  • a priest for 30.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 37
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014