Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick James Byrne, M.M. †

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to Korea

Titular Bishop of Gazera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1888Born
23 Jun 191526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
9 Nov 192739.0AppointedPrefect of Peng-yang, Korea (North)
12 Aug 192940.7ResignedPrefect of Peng-yang, Korea (North)
19 Mar 193748.3AppointedPrefect of Kyoto, Japan
10 Oct 194051.9ResignedPrefect of Kyoto, Japan
7 Apr 194960.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Korea
7 Apr 194960.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gazera
14 Jun 194960.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gazera
25 Nov 195062.0DiedApostolic Delegate to Korea

MicroData Summary for Patrick James Byrne (VIAF: 53804657)
Bishop Patrick James Byrne M.M. (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of Korea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWashington, USA
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Seoul, Vicariate Apostolic of Seoul

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1949, Number 40
  • ob/ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 78, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast