Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Mary Gorman

Deceased

Bishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1861Born
24 Jun 189332.1Ordained PriestPriest of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
8 Feb 191856.8AppointedBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA
1 May 191857.0Ordained BishopBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA
15 May 191857.0InstalledBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA
9 Jun 192766.1DiedBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel Mary Gorman
Bishop Daniel Mary Gorman (born , died ) Bishop of Boise City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnamosa, IA, Diocese of Dubuque, Iowa
Death PlaceHospital, Lewiston, ID, Diocese of Boise City, Idaho
Buried Place (Original)Morris Hill, Cemetery, Boise, Diocese of Boise City, Idaho

  • a priest for 33.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 12 Oct 2019

Quantcast