Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arthur Jerome Drossaerts

Deceased

Archbishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1862Born
15 Jun 188926.7Ordained PriestPriest of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
18 Jul 191855.8AppointedBishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
8 Dec 191856.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
3 Aug 192663.8AppointedArchbishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
8 Sep 194077.9DiedArchbishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Arthur Jerome Drossaerts
Archbishop Arthur Jerome Drossaerts (born , died ) Archbishop of San Antonio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBreda, Netherlands

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 60
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 64
  • c1: CB, 26 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast