Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolas Dobrecić

Deceased

Archbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1872Born
1 Jan 189825.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
16 Jan 191239.9AppointedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
10 Mar 191240.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
14 Nov 195583.8DiedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Dobrecić
Archbishop Nicolas Dobrecić (born , died ) Archbishop of Bar (Antivari)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAntivari

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,912, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast