Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Belisario de Bellis

Deceased

Bishop of Molfetta, Italy

Vicegerent of Roma {Rome}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1647Born
21 Dec 166922.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Sep 167023.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jan 169648.8AppointedBishop of Molfetta, Italy
23 Jan 169648.8AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
25 Feb 169648.9Ordained BishopBishop of Molfetta, Italy
17 Jan 170153.8DiedBishop of Molfetta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Belisario de Bellis
Bishop Domenico Belisario de Bellis (born , died ) Bishop of Molfetta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTuri

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 265
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast