Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Feoli

Deceased

Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1657³BornMontesarchio
21 Sep 169033.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Sep 169033.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 169841.2AppointedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
21 Dec 169841.2Ordained BishopBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
6 Nov 170144.1DiedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Feoli:
Bishop Sebastiano Feoli (born , died ) Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia)

  • a priest for 11.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 215
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015