Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Rosignoli

Deceased

Bishop of Nona (Nin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1660BornTrau
30 Mar 170039.7AppointedBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
4 Apr 170039.7Ordained BishopBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
27 Nov 171353.3AppointedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
Jun 1715³54.9DiedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Rosignoli:
Bishop Antonio Rosignoli (born , died Jun 1715) Bishop of Nona (Nin)

  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 95, and Page 292
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 4 May 2015