Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Corcione

Deceased

Bishop of Capaccio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1655Born
23 Sep 167924.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 169943.7AppointedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
12 Apr 169943.7Ordained BishopBishop of Capaccio, Italy
8 Nov 170348.3DiedBishop of Capaccio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Corcione
Bishop Vincenzo Corcione (born , died ) Bishop of Capaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 24.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 142
  • c34: CB, 17 Mar 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast