Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Falces, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pozzuoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1643BornEzcaray, Spain
11 Apr 169956.3AppointedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
12 Apr 169956.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
Nov 1703³60.8DiedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Falces:
Bishop Giuseppe Falces O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Pozzuoli

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 325
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 240, Number 1,490

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013