Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Francesco Nicolai, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Houkouang, China

Titular Archbishop of Myra


Events

DateEventTitle
1691²AppointedBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China
1694¹ResignedBishop-Elect of Nanking [Nanjing], China
20 Oct 1696AppointedVicar Apostolic of Houkouang, China
20 Oct 1696AppointedTitular Bishop of Berytus
7 Mar 1700Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Berytus
20 Apr 1712AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
27 Dec 1737DiedVicar Apostolic of Houkouang, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Nicolai (VIAF: 89314920)
Archbishop Giovanni Francesco Nicolai O.F.M. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Houkouang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeonessa, Diocese of Rieti, Italy
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 118, and Page 278
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,700, Number 1
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast