Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Filippo Anastasio

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Sorrento

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1656BornNapoli
11 Apr 169943.2AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
12 Apr 169943.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
13 Dec 172468.8ResignedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
20 Dec 172468.8AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
11 May 173579.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Sorrento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Anastasio:
Patriarch Filippo Anastasio (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sorrento

  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 89, and Page 366
  • c34: CB, 17 Mar 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015